NY S05286 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adjudication and violation procedures in juvenile delinquency and PINS cases.
Title
Relates to adjudication and violation procedures in juvenile delinquency and PINS cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.499 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.538 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a5897 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1009 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05897 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5286