NY S05270 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the civil committment of detained persons convicted of a misdemeanor sex offense or with a prior conviction in another state of an offense that would be a designated felony.
Title
Authorizes the civil committment of detained persons convicted of a misdemeanor sex offense or with a prior conviction in another state of an offense that would be a designated felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1551 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1559 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |