NY S05242 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6126A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6126A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits insurers from reducing disability benefits due to the actual or anticipated receipt of social security disability benefits unless certain conditions are met.
Title
Prohibits insurers from reducing disability benefits due to the actual or anticipated receipt of social security disability benefits unless certain conditions are met.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6126A |
2024-05-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5242A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.879 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2023-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06126 (Same As) 2024-11-22 - tabled