NY S05230 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes tax credits for premiums paid for life insurance which is used for long term health care.
Title
Establishes tax credits for premiums paid for life insurance which is used for long term health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.268 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.675 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7607a |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1498 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5230A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |