NY S05226 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits class A-1 and B-1 distilleries to sell liquor manufactured by the licensee for consumption on the premises.
Title
Permits class A-1 and B-1 distilleries to sell liquor manufactured by the licensee for consumption on the premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.882 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5226A |
2016-02-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.925 |
2015-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A07391 (Same As) 2016-03-08 - held for consideration in economic development