NY S05210 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Doctors Across New York program to include dentists.
Title
Expands the Doctors Across New York program to include dentists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
2012-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.34 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.753 |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07179 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to health