NY S05194 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - PRINT NUMBER 5194C
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - PRINT NUMBER 5194C
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of veteran to include members of the commissioned corps of the NOAA and the commissioned corps of the public health service; expands access to certain benefits to those who served in the commissioned corps of the NOAA and the commissioned corps of the public health service.
Title
Expands the definition of veteran to include members of the commissioned corps of the NOAA and the commissioned corps of the public health service; expands access to certain benefits to those who served in the commissioned corps of the NOAA and the commissioned corps of the public health service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5194C |
2024-04-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2024-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5194B |
2024-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5194A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2023-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08914 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS