NY S05183 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the forest ranger force to establish a training program for volunteer search and rescue personnel to assist the forest rangers in wild, remote and forested areas of the state.
Title
Authorizes the forest ranger force to establish a training program for volunteer search and rescue personnel to assist the forest rangers in wild, remote and forested areas of the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1102 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00514 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to environmental conservation