NY S05183 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5183A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5183A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to claims for loss or damage to real property; creates continuing education requirements for licensed persons and qualifications for public and independent adjusters; allows for a revocation of licenses with an opportunity to reapply for such licenses.
Title
Relates to claims for loss or damage to real property; creates continuing education requirements for licensed persons and qualifications for public and independent adjusters; allows for a revocation of licenses with an opportunity to reapply for such licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5183A |
2014-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2013-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00908 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - ordered to third reading rules cal.47