NY S05180 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for employment of an individual who has successfully completed a judicial diversion substance abuse treatment program or graduated from drug court.
Title
Establishes a tax credit for employment of an individual who has successfully completed a judicial diversion substance abuse treatment program or graduated from drug court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5180A |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1198 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A05506 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - enacting clause stricken