NY S05136 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state vaccination awareness campaign and directs the department of health to contract with a consultant to promote and maintain the New York state vaccination awareness campaign; establishes the gift for the New York state vaccination awareness campaign and allows a check-off space on the personal income tax return to enable a taxpayer to make such contribution; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes the New York state vaccination awareness campaign and directs the department of health to contract with a consultant to promote and maintain the New York state vaccination awareness campaign; establishes the gift for the New York state vaccination awareness campaign and allows a check-off space on the personal income tax return to enable a taxpayer to make such contribution; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1342 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5136B |
2019-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5136A |
2019-04-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07451 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health