NY S05122 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crimes of criminal trespass on a school bus, school grounds or children's camp.
Title
Establishes the crimes of criminal trespass on a school bus, school grounds or children's camp.
Sponsors
Sen. John Flanagan [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] |
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.905 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1356 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06385 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to codes