NY S05120 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Discontinues the use of a parcel of land within the village of Tarrytown and alienates the parcel for the purpose of transferring land previously agreed to by the village and also to make an undersized and irregularly shaped parcel more zoning compliant.
Title
Discontinues the use of a parcel of land within the village of Tarrytown and alienates the parcel for the purpose of transferring land previously agreed to by the village and also to make an undersized and irregularly shaped parcel more zoning compliant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.559 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.387 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7134 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1215 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07134 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.559