NY S05116 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to freshwater wetlands; defines specific classes of wetlands.
Title
Relates to freshwater wetlands; defines specific classes of wetlands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.77 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5116C |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | AMENDED 5116B |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.979 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5116A |
2021-04-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07850 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to environmental conservation