NY S05115 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
Pending: Senate Internet and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
Pending: Senate Internet and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring internet service providers to charge a residential rate to emergency service organizations; creates a new article for the regulation of internet service providers.
Title
Relates to requiring internet service providers to charge a residential rate to emergency service organizations; creates a new article for the regulation of internet service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1205 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |