NY S05083 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of aggravated cruelty to animals to include harm to animals during the commission of a felony.
Title
Expands the definition of aggravated cruelty to animals to include harm to animals during the commission of a felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A01632 (Same As) 2012-05-08 - held for consideration in agriculture