NY S05061 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of the term "mail" with respect to allowing electronic delivery of notices of premium finance agencies with insured consent.
Title
Amends the definition of the term "mail" with respect to allowing electronic delivery of notices of premium finance agencies with insured consent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5061B |
2018-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5061A |
2018-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1136 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.534 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A02476 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - print number 2476c