NY S05059 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the definition of communication for purposes of abandoned property; includes any written, electronic, or personal contact between an owner and a holder of record that can be documented and that reflects an owner's awareness of the existence of the property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the definition of communication for purposes of abandoned property; includes any written, electronic, or personal contact between an owner and a holder of record that can be documented and that reflects an owner's awareness of the existence of the property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-31Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1367
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1552
2017-06-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 5059A
2017-06-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2017-06-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-03-06SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback