NY S05056 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires kindergarten instruction for Rockland and Westchester counties for minors who are five years of age on or before December first.
Title
Requires kindergarten instruction for Rockland and Westchester counties for minors who are five years of age on or before December first.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | referred to education |
2014-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1704 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05786 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - held for consideration in education