NY S05032 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - PRINT NUMBER 5032A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - PRINT NUMBER 5032A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding embryo to the definition of "tissue" for purposes of tissue storage.
Title
Relates to adding embryo to the definition of "tissue" for purposes of tissue storage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5032A |
2020-06-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07214 (Same As) 2020-07-13 - reported referred to rules