NY S05027 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limiting base proportion for the 2013-2014 assessment roll in the county of Suffolk.
Title
Relates to limiting base proportion for the 2013-2014 assessment roll in the county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.281 |
2013-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.270 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7574 |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1062 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07574 (Same As) 2013-06-17 - substituted by s5027