NY A07574 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-17 - substituted by s5027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-17 - substituted by s5027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limiting base proportion for the 2013-2014 assessment roll in the county of Suffolk.
Title
Relates to limiting base proportion for the 2013-2014 assessment roll in the county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5027 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.270 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.270 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05027 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.281