NY S05020 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to provide authorizations to all fiscal intermediaries that timely submit a request for authorization prior to January 1, 2024; details information required for such authorizations; makes related provisions.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to provide authorizations to all fiscal intermediaries that timely submit a request for authorization prior to January 1, 2024; details information required for such authorizations; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-04-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5020A |
2023-04-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2023-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05281 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to health