NY S05015 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the promotion of personnel to the positions of General Superintendent 2 and General Superintendent 3; provides that such positions shall be filled as far as practicable by promotion from among persons holding competitive class positions in a lower grade in the sanitation department of the city of New York in which the vacancy exists.
Title
Authorizes the promotion of personnel to the positions of General Superintendent 2 and General Superintendent 3; provides that such positions shall be filled as far as practicable by promotion from among persons holding competitive class positions in a lower grade in the sanitation department of the city of New York in which the vacancy exists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.506 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-31 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5015A |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1312 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05210 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees