NY S05011 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-23 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-23 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to course work or training in early recognition of and intervention for eating disorders.
Title
Relates to course work or training in early recognition of and intervention for eating disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | referred to education | |
2010-06-22 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-22 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-22 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1083 | |
2010-06-22 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-18 | PRINT NUMBER 5011B | |
2010-06-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION | |
2010-06-04 | PRINT NUMBER 5011A | |
2010-06-04 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A8249 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - print number 8249b