NY A08249 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - print number 8249b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - print number 8249b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to course work or training in early recognition of and intervention for eating disorders.
Title
Relates to course work or training in early recognition of and intervention for eating disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | print number 8249b | |
2010-06-24 | amend and recommit to higher education | |
2010-06-21 | print number 8249a | |
2010-06-21 | amend and recommit to higher education | |
2010-01-06 | referred to higher education | |
2009-05-11 | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S5011 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - referred to education