NY S05007 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5007A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5007A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to clarifying health education.
Title
Relates to clarifying health education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5007A |
2014-02-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01911 (Same As) 2014-02-07 - print number 1911a