NY S04986 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption from sales and use taxes for certain personal property manufactured and sold by veterans.
Title
Provides an exemption from sales and use taxes for certain personal property manufactured and sold by veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.478 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.495 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a8480 |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.994 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1417 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08480 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s4986