NY S04981 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1297B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1297B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospitals to adopt, implement and periodically update standard protocols for the management of fetal demise.
Title
Requires hospitals to adopt, implement and periodically update standard protocols for the management of fetal demise.
Sponsors
Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1297B |
2023-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1844 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4981B |
2023-06-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2023-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4981A |
2023-05-26 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2023-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A01297 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - signed chap.542