NY S04977 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to process server records; provides for oversight of process server records by third party contractors.
Title
Relates to process server records; provides for oversight of process server records by third party contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2020-01-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.196 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.874 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03579 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to economic development