NY S04975 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes certain newspaper delivery persons from the provisions of unemployment, minimum wage and workers' compensation.
Title
Excludes certain newspaper delivery persons from the provisions of unemployment, minimum wage and workers' compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7753 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1109 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07753 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - tabled