NY S04960 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - PRINT NUMBER 4960A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - PRINT NUMBER 4960A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an agricultural crop loss personal income tax credit.
Title
Creates an agricultural crop loss personal income tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4960A |
2016-02-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07277 (Same As) 2016-02-24 - print number 7277a