NY S04900 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Hands Across Long Island, Inc. to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption for certain property in Ronkonkoma, Suffolk county.
Title
Authorizes Hands Across Long Island, Inc. to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption for certain property in Ronkonkoma, Suffolk county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7302 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.645 |
2011-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07302 (Same As) 2011-08-03 - signed chap.303