NY S04879 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Mandala Buddhist Association to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.
Title
Permits the Mandala Buddhist Association to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.165 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.132 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a7144c |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2016-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4879C |
2016-05-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4879B |
2016-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.527 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4879A |
2016-03-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.623 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07144 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s4879c