NY S04855 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a statewide residential revaluation exemption; defines "eligible residential property"; and provides applicability, eligibility and the exemption calculation.
Title
Creates a statewide residential revaluation exemption; defines "eligible residential property"; and provides applicability, eligibility and the exemption calculation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3489 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.754 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03489 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - signed chap.560