NY S04845 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5036B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5036B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adoptee rights; clarifies language and procedures for obtaining birth certificates and medical histories of adoptees; permits an adopted adult to access certain records when they reach the age of 18; creates a contact preference to be filed by birth parents.
Title
Relates to adoptee rights; clarifies language and procedures for obtaining birth certificates and medical histories of adoptees; permits an adopted adult to access certain records when they reach the age of 18; creates a contact preference to be filed by birth parents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5036B |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2207 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4845B |
2017-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4845A |
2017-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05036 (Same As) 2017-12-29 - tabled