NY S04814 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a 75-25 percent split in the New York city transit authority's operating surplus between the authority and the Metropolitan transit authority where previously the split was 50-50.
Title
Provides for a 75-25 percent split in the New York city transit authority's operating surplus between the authority and the Metropolitan transit authority where previously the split was 50-50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05781 (Same As) 2012-04-26 - enacting clause stricken
A10001 (Same As) 2012-05-15 - reported referred to ways and means
A10001 (Same As) 2012-05-15 - reported referred to ways and means