NY S04805 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7989A
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7989A
Summary
Authorizes the Brocton central school district to repay, over a period of 6 years, certain excess state aid provided during the 2004-2005 school year.
Title
Authorizes the Brocton central school district to repay, over a period of 6 years, certain excess state aid provided during the 2004-2005 school year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-15 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7989A | |
2009-07-09 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4805A | |
2009-06-02 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-01 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-27 | 1ST REPORT CAL.502 | |
2009-05-12 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A7989-A (Same As) 2009-08-26 - tabled
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04805&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |