NY S04802 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7058
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7058
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands and extends the duration of the green roof real property tax abatement in a city having a population of one million or more.
Title
Expands and extends the duration of the green roof real property tax abatement in a city having a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7058 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.699 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07058 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - signed chap.524