NY S04779 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7461A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7461A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to inheritance by children conceived after the death of a genetic parent.
Title
Relates to inheritance by children conceived after the death of a genetic parent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7461A |
2014-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.192 |
2014-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4779B |
2014-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4779A |
2013-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2013-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07461 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - signed chap.439