NY S04778 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to aid for substantial enrollment growth and growth in enrollment of English language learner students.
Title
Relates to aid for substantial enrollment growth and growth in enrollment of English language learner students.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Elaine Phillips [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2206 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05717 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to education