NY S04764 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 4764A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 4764A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of social media websites, email or text messages for the purpose of debt collection.
Title
Prohibits the use of social media websites, email or text messages for the purpose of debt collection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4764A |
2022-02-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08622 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - print number 8622a