NY S04759 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires counties to maintain a confidential registry of people of all ages with disabilities for the purpose of evacuating and sheltering such persons during disasters.
Title
Requires counties to maintain a confidential registry of people of all ages with disabilities for the purpose of evacuating and sheltering such persons during disasters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2013-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A06432 (Same As) 2014-01-14 - enacting clause stricken
A08816 (Same As) 2014-05-19 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
A08816 (Same As) 2014-05-19 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS