NY S04757 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.295
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.295
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a resident curator program for the rehabilitation of state park buildings.
Title
Establishes a resident curator program for the rehabilitation of state park buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.295 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.261 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a7392a |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4757A |
2014-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.479 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2013-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.746 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07392 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - substituted by s4757a