NY S04741 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the rural health council within the Charles D. Cook office of rural health to advise the commissioner of health on rural health matters, to assist such office, contribute to the biennial report on rural health, and act as an advocate on rural health matters.
Title
Establishes the rural health council within the Charles D. Cook office of rural health to advise the commissioner of health on rural health matters, to assist such office, contribute to the biennial report on rural health, and act as an advocate on rural health matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7203 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1145 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07203 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - approval memo.21