NY S04716 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of information technology services to advise all state agencies in the implementation of language translation technology.
Title
Requires the office of information technology services to advise all state agencies in the implementation of language translation technology.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.140 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.785 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.577 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a6215a |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.674 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4716A |
2021-04-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A06215 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4716a