NY S04670 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1960A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1960A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of taxation and finance to include a space on the personal income tax return for taxpayers to check off if they wish to contribute to the state library aid program for financial support for public libraries.
Title
Directs the commissioner of taxation and finance to include a space on the personal income tax return for taxpayers to check off if they wish to contribute to the state library aid program for financial support for public libraries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1960A |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4670A |
2021-05-24 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.521 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A01960 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - signed chap.498