NY S04670 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the county of Nassau, to accept from Lubavitch of Old Westbury, an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the county of Nassau, to accept from Lubavitch of Old Westbury, an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.159 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.145 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a10584 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.441 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-05-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.389 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10584 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.159