NY S04662 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6496A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6496A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York State Trooper Timothy Pratt Memorial Bridge.
Title
Establishes the New York State Trooper Timothy Pratt Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6496A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4662A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-04-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.474 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06496 (Same As) 2017-07-24 - signed chap.95