NY S04655 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-02 - VETOED MEMO.85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-02 - VETOED MEMO.85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that volunteer firefighters who die or have died in the line of duty, as determined by an authoritative agency, have their names inscribed on the New York state fallen firefighter memorial.
Title
Provides that volunteer firefighters who die or have died in the line of duty, as determined by an authoritative agency, have their names inscribed on the New York state fallen firefighter memorial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-02 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.85 |
2011-12-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.400 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a5933 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1192 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-04-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05933 (Same As) 2011-06-17 - substituted by s4655